Formerly: National Assembly
Ms Thembisile C. Majola previously served as the Deputy Minister of Energy since 26 May 2014. She was born in Soweto, Johannesburg. She received her basic education from Botswana, Zambia and Cuba, where she also received her Junior Degree in Civil Engineering in Camaguey. She also holds a Masters Degree in the same field. She worked as a Project & Site Engineer at Solomon Mahlangu Freedom College (SOMAFCO), Mazimbu, Tanzania from 1986-1987, whereafter she received Umkhonto we Sizwe Military Training, Caculama, Angola from 1987-1988. She was the Executive Secretary Women and Development Programme, World Council of Churches, Geneva, Switzerland from 1993-97 and then became the Chief Director International Relations and Trade, Office of the Deputy President from 1997-2001. She was 2006-2008 Ambassador Extraordinaire et Plenipotentiare to Senegal, Mauritania, Cape Verde, Gambia & Guinea Bissau. In 2009 she became the Deputy Coordinator - Core Business, National Intelligence Coordinating Committee;in 2010 she was a Consultant in the Office of the Premier, Gauteng. From 2010-2013 she was the Market Development Manager for Africa, Aurecon.From 2013 to early May 2014 she was the Director, Thenoma Consulting, Ekurhuleni, Gauteng. She currently serves as the Deputy Minister of Energy of the Republic of South Africa since 26 May 2014
Her political activities include:1987- ANC Women’s Section Conference, Luanda, Angola (Angolan region delegate): 1987-89 – Secretary, ANC Women’s Section, Angola: 1989-90 – MALIBONGWE Conference Committee: 1990-91- ANC Women’s Task Force, Johannesburg, RSA. Source: energy.gov.za
African National Congress (ANC)
Not associated with any constituency offices
012 406 7306
[email protected]
012 444 4505
Deputy Minister of Energy at National Executive (Executive)
from 25th May 2014 until 1st January 2019
Member at National Assembly (Parliament)
from 25th May 2014 until 1st January 2019
132nd Candidate at African National Congress National Election List 2014 (Election List)
from 22nd April 2014 until 7th May 2014
Fetching the latest messages to Thembi Majola …
2018 committee attendance as minister/deputy
Attended 6 meetings
2017 committee attendance as minister/deputy
Attended 15 meetings
2016 committee attendance as minister/deputy
Attended 2 meetings
DISCLAIMER: This information has been obtained via the Parliamentary Monitoring Group. PMG makes every effort to compile reliable and comprehensive information, but does not claim that the data is 100% accurate and complete.
Committee meetings are planned events where real-world impactful work happens such as law-making, oversight and public participation - which are all cornerstones of the work our MPs do. Although often citizens focus on the public debate taking place in main chambers, the majority of MPs' time is spent working within committees. Here is a place to see what your committee is saying.
No appearances found
Written questions and feedback are essential tools used by MPs for oversight and hold the executive accountable. This oversight mechanism allows MPs’ to extract detailed information that would normally be difficult to comprehend through oral engagement. You can see the questions that your MPs are asking here.
How many security threat assessments has his department and/or any entity reporting to him made recommending the assigning of (a) ...
Plenary sessions are forums that have been created for the purpose of public debate and decision-making. This mechanism is used to convey the messages of our MPs within main chambers on important decisions, like how they vote.
21 Jul 2014
Good morning, and thank you, Chairperson. Hon Chairperson, Minister of Energy, Ms Tina Joemat-Pettersson, hon chairperson of the Portfolio Committee for Energy, Mr Fikile Majola, fellow members of the executive, ...
What are declaration of interests?
PENSIONS
2 items
Source | Public/Private |
---|---|
F E Mpumzana Government Pension |
Public |
GEPF 2010 |
Private |
SHARES AND OTHER FINANCIAL INTERESTS
1 items
Nominal Value | No | Name of Company | Nature |
---|---|---|---|
No Dividend |
4000 |
Thenoma |
Ordinary |
DIRECTORSHIP AND PARTNERSHIPS
2 items
Directorship/Partnership | Type of Business |
---|---|
Thenoma Consulting |
Business Development (Dormant) |
Maboko Trading |
Dormant |
GIFTS AND HOSPITALITY
2 items
Source | Description | Value |
---|---|---|
Inkosi Buthelezi from Ulundi |
Traditional gesture by Inkosi to the visitors (16 March 2018) |
R1000 |
Inkosi Buthelezi from Ulundi |
Traditional gesture by Inkosi to the visitors (16 March 2018) |
R1000 |
LAND AND PROPERTY
3 items
Description | Extent | Location |
---|---|---|
Stand alone House |
/-500sq.m |
Bedfordview |
Stan Alone House |
/-500sq.m |
Illiondale |
Townhouse |
/-150sq.m |
Edenvale |
PENSIONS
2 items
Source | Public/Private |
---|---|
FE Mnumzana Government Pension |
Public |
GEPF 2010 |
Public |
SHARES AND OTHER FINANCIAL INTERESTS
1 items
No | Name of Company | Nature |
---|---|---|
4000 |
Thenoma |
Ordinary |
DIRECTORSHIP AND PARTNERSHIPS
2 items
Directorship/Partnership | Type of Business |
---|---|
Thenoma Consulting |
Business Development (Dormant) |
Maboko Trading |
Dormant for 5 years |
LAND AND PROPERTY
3 items
Description | Extent | Location |
---|---|---|
House |
500sq.m |
13A Flecthing Avenue, Essexwold |
House |
500sq.m |
52 Karen Road, Illiondale |
Townhouse |
150sq.m |
62 The Glen, Edenglen, Edenvale |
PENSIONS
2 items
Source | Public/Private |
---|---|
Special Pension |
Public |
GEPF - Stanlib |
Private |
SHARES AND OTHER FINANCIAL INTERESTS
1 items
Nominal Value | No | Name of Company | Nature |
---|---|---|---|
No dividend |
4 000 |
Thenoma |
Ordinary |
DIRECTORSHIP AND PARTNERSHIPS
2 items
Directorship/Partnership | Type of Business |
---|---|
Thenoma Consultancy |
Business development [Dormant] |
Maboko Trading |
[Dormant] |
LAND AND PROPERTY
3 items
Description | Extent | Location |
---|---|---|
Standard house |
+-500sq.m. |
Edenvale |
Stand alone house |
+-500sq.m. |
Edenvale |
Townhouse |
+-150sq.m. |
Edenglen |
PENSIONS
2 items
Source | Public/Private |
---|---|
Government Employees Pension |
Public |
Stanlib |
Private |
SHARES AND OTHER FINANCIAL INTERESTS
2 items
Nominal Value | No | Name of Company | Nature |
---|---|---|---|
No dividends |
4 000 |
Thenoma |
Ordinary |
R44 000 |
22 000 |
Batho Bonke |
Ordinary |
DIRECTORSHIP AND PARTNERSHIPS
2 items
Directorship/Partnership | Type of Business |
---|---|
Thenoma Consulting |
Business Development [Dormant] |
Maboko Trading |
[Dormant] |
LAND AND PROPERTY
3 items
Description | Extent | Location |
---|---|---|
House |
+-500sq.m. |
Edenvale |
Townhouse |
+-150sq.m. |
Edenvale |
Stand alone house |
+-500sq.m. |
Edenvale |