Formerly: National Assembly
Died 16th September 2021
Hlengiwe Mkhize was the Deputy Minister in the Presidency for Women, Youth and People with Disabilities. Prof Mkhize previously served as the Minister of Higher Education and Training after a brief stint as the Minister of Home Affairs. She was born 6 September 1952. She served as a Member of Parliament since 2009. She was a founding member and trustee of the Children and Violence Trust since 1995 and trustee of the Malibongwe Business Trust from 2005. Professor Mkhize holds a BA degree in Psychology, Social Work and Sociology (University of Zululand), BA Hons (Psychology) and a Master's in Clinical Psychology from the University of Natal. She was a senior lecturer and researcher at Wits from 1990 until 1995. She was a board member of the South African Prisoner's Organisation for Human Rights from 1994 to 1995, Truth and Reconciliation Commission (TRC) Commissioner and Chairperson of the Reparations and Rehabilitation committee from 1995 to 2003. Prior to her appointment, Prof Mkhize was ambassador to the Netherlands, had a short stint as Deputy Minister for Correctional Services and Deputy Minister of Telecommunications and Postal Services. Source: (info.gov.za)
African National Congress (ANC)
Not associated with any constituency offices
None available.
Deputy Minister in the Presidency: Women, Youth and Persons with Disabilities at National Executive (Executive)
from 29th May 2019 until 16th September 2021
Member at National Assembly (Parliament)
from 22nd May 2019 until 16th September 2021
Member at African National Congress (ANC) (Party)
until 16th September 2021
68th Candidate at African National Congress National Election List 2019 (Election List)
from 23rd April 2019 until 8th May 2019
Chairperson at Portfolio Committee on Communications and Digital Technologies (National Assembly Committees)
from 25th October 2018 until 7th May 2019
Constituency Contact at ANC Constituency Office (110): Vanderbijlpark (Constituency Office)
from 21st May 2014 until 7th May 2019
Member at National Assembly (Parliament)
from 21st May 2014 until 7th May 2019
Member at Portfolio Committee on Basic Education (National Assembly Committees)
from 17th May 2018 until 25th October 2018
Member at Portfolio Committee on International Relations and Cooperation (National Assembly Committees)
from 17th May 2018 until 25th October 2018
Minister of Higher Education at National Executive (Executive)
from 17th October 2017 until 26th February 2018
Minister of Home Affairs at National Executive (Executive)
from 30th March 2017 until 17th October 2017
Deputy Minister of Telecommunications and Postal services at National Executive (Executive)
from 26th May 2014 until 30th March 2017
Member-elect at National Assembly (Parliament)
from 16th May 2014 until 21st May 2014
50th Candidate at African National Congress National Election List 2014 (Election List)
from 22nd April 2014 until 7th May 2014
Constituency Contact at ANC Constituency Office (152): Chief Albert Luthuli House 1 (Constituency Office)
from 10th May 2014 until 6th May 2014
Member at National Assembly (Parliament)
from 6th May 2009 until 6th May 2014
Constituency Contact at ANC Constituency Office (152): Chief Albert Luthuli House 1 (Constituency Office)
until 6th May 2014
Deputy Minister of Economic Development at National Executive (Executive)
from 12th June 2012 until 24th April 2014
Deputy Minister of Higher Education at National Executive (Executive)
from 31st October 2010 until 12th June 2012
Fetching the latest messages to Hlengiwe Mkhize …
Committee meetings are planned events where real-world impactful work happens such as law-making, oversight and public participation - which are all cornerstones of the work our MPs do. Although often citizens focus on the public debate taking place in main chambers, the majority of MPs' time is spent working within committees. Here is a place to see what your committee is saying.
No appearances found
Written questions and feedback are essential tools used by MPs for oversight and hold the executive accountable. This oversight mechanism allows MPs’ to extract detailed information that would normally be difficult to comprehend through oral engagement. You can see the questions that your MPs are asking here.
No questions found
Plenary sessions are forums that have been created for the purpose of public debate and decision-making. This mechanism is used to convey the messages of our MPs within main chambers on important decisions, like how they vote.
Hon Chair, hon members, the department introduced the Films and Publications Board Amendment Bill in response to an ever-changing landscape, precipitated by the advancement in technology. The amending Bill is ...
Hon House Chairperson and hon members, public broadcasting is at a centrefold of public participation in the democratic discourse and for this reason, the SA Broadcasting Corporation, SABC, will forever ...
What are declaration of interests?
PENSIONS
3 items
Source | Public/Private |
---|---|
Old Mutual |
Private |
Liberty Life |
Private |
PPS |
Private |
SHARES AND OTHER FINANCIAL INTERESTS
1 items
Nominal Value | Number of Shares | Name of Company | Nature |
---|---|---|---|
+ R 2 million |
6 |
Aerosud Pty Ltd |
Engineering |
TRUSTS
3 items
Details of all benefits derived | Registration Number | Trustee/Beneficiary | Name of Trust |
---|---|---|---|
Nil |
NPO |
Abused Children |
National Children and Voilence Trust Foundation |
Nil |
|
Women Development |
Malibongwe |
Nil |
|
Children Development |
Nolwazi STEM Education |
DIRECTORSHIP AND PARTNERSHIPS
1 items
Directorship/Partnership in any Corporate Body | Type of Business Activity |
---|---|
Aerosud Pty Ltd |
Engineering |
LAND AND PROPERTY
3 items
Extent of the Property | Location – Area | Description of Property |
---|---|---|
850 square Meters |
Witkoppen Ext 6,Gauteng |
Residential Property |
1001 square Meters |
Ballito ,Durban |
Residential Property |
7000 square Meters |
Hilton ,PMB |
Small Holding |
PENSIONS
3 items
Source | Public/Private |
---|---|
Old Mutual |
Private |
Liberty Life |
Private |
PPS |
Private |
SHARES AND OTHER FINANCIAL INTERESTS
1 items
Nominal Value | Number of Shares | Name of Company | Nature |
---|---|---|---|
± 9m |
7 |
Aerosud PTY LTD |
Engineering |
TRUSTS
4 items
Details of all benefits derived | Registration Number | Trustee/Beneficiary | Name of Trust |
---|---|---|---|
Nil |
NPO |
Abused Children |
National Children and Violence Trust |
Nil |
|
Women Development |
Malibongwe |
Nil |
|
Rural Children |
Nolwazi |
|
|
|
STEM Education |
DIRECTORSHIP AND PARTNERSHIPS
1 items
Directorship/Partnership in any Corporate Body | Type of Business Activity |
---|---|
Aerosud PTY LTD |
Engineering |
LAND AND PROPERTY
3 items
Extent of the Property | Location – Area | Description of Property |
---|---|---|
850 m² |
Witkoppen |
Residential Property |
7000 m² |
Hiltton PMBG |
Small holding |
1001 m² |
Ballito (Kwaduza) |
Residential Property |
PENSIONS
3 items
Source | Public/Private |
---|---|
Old Mutual |
Private |
Sanlam |
Private |
Liberty Life |
Private |
SHARES AND OTHER FINANCIAL INTERESTS
1 items
No | Name of Company | Nature |
---|---|---|
9 |
Aerosud (Pty)Ltd |
Regular |
TRUSTS
1 items
Details Of Benefits | Trustee/Beneficiary | Name Of Trusts |
---|---|---|
Linked to Personal Bank Account |
Trustee |
Mkhize Family Trust |
DIRECTORSHIP AND PARTNERSHIPS
1 items
Directorship/Partnership | Type of Business |
---|---|
Aerosud (Pty) Ltd |
Engineering |
LAND AND PROPERTY
3 items
Description | Extent | Location |
---|---|---|
Stand 652 |
850sq.m |
Witkoppen |
Sweet Waters |
7600 sq.m |
Hylton |
189 Vulundlela |
920sq.m |
Kwa-Dlangezwa |
PENSIONS
2 items
Source | Public/Private |
---|---|
Sanlam |
Private |
Old Mutual |
Private |
SHARES AND OTHER FINANCIAL INTERESTS
1 items
No | Name of Company | Nature |
---|---|---|
9 |
Aerosud (Pty) Ltd |
Regular |
DIRECTORSHIP AND PARTNERSHIPS
4 items
Directorship/Partnership | Type of Business |
---|---|
Aerosud (Pty) Ltd |
Aviation/Engineering |
Malibongwe Development Trust Women empowerment |
|
National Children Trust |
Children's Trust |
Andrew Mlangeni Foundation |
|
LAND AND PROPERTY
3 items
Description | Extent | Location |
---|---|---|
Stand 652 |
850sq.m. |
Fourways |
Plot |
920sq.m. |
Vulundela, Empangeni |
Plot |
7 600sq.m. |
Sweetwaters, Hilton |
SHARES AND OTHER FINANCIAL INTERESTS
1 items
No | Name of Company | Nature |
---|---|---|
7 |
Aerosud (Pty) Ltd |
Ordinary |
TRUSTS
2 items
Details Of Benefits | Trustee/Beneficiary | Name Of Trusts |
---|---|---|
Women Development |
None |
Malibongwe |
Not for profit Children's rights |
None |
National Children and Violence Trust |
DIRECTORSHIP AND PARTNERSHIPS
1 items
Directorship/Partnership | Type of Business |
---|---|
Aerosud |
Aerosud/Aeronautical Engineering |
LAND AND PROPERTY
3 items
Description | Location |
---|---|
Residential |
Witkoppen |
Plot |
Vulindlela, KZN |
Plot |
Sweetwaters, KZN |
DIRECTORSHIP AND PARTNERSHIPS
3 items
Directorship/Partnership | Type of Business |
---|---|
Malibongwe Development Trust |
Women empowerment |
June & Andrew Mlangeni Foundation |
Development |
National Children and Violence Trust |
Children's rights |
LAND AND PROPERTY
2 items
Description | Location | Extent |
---|---|---|
Vacant plot |
Empangeni |
|
Stand |
Fourways |
800sq.m. |
SHARES AND OTHER FINANCIAL INTERESTS
4 items
Name of Company | Nature | Nominal Value | No |
---|---|---|---|
Old Mutual |
Unit Trust |
|
|
Sanlam |
Sanlam Insurance |
|
|
Liberty Life |
Liberty Life Insurance |
|
|
Aerosud (Pty) Ltd |
Ordinary |
+-R9 million |
9 |
DIRECTORSHIP AND PARTNERSHIPS
1 items
Directorship/Partnership | Type of Business |
---|---|
Aerosud (Pty) Ltd |
Aviation |
LAND AND PROPERTY
2 items
Description | Extent | Location |
---|---|---|
Stand 289 |
850sq.m. |
Vulindlela |
Stand 652 |
980sq.m. |
Witkoppen Ext. 6 |
SHARES AND OTHER FINANCIAL INTERESTS
1 items
Name of Company | Nature |
---|---|
Mkhize Family Trust |
Family Trust |
DIRECTORSHIP AND PARTNERSHIPS
1 items
Directorship/Partnership |
---|
Aerosud [Non-Execuitive Director] |
LAND AND PROPERTY
2 items
Description | Extent | Location |
---|---|---|
Stand |
850sq.m. |
Witkoppen Ext |
Property |
903sq.m. |
Empangeni |
PENSIONS
2 items
Source | Public/Private |
---|---|
Liberty |
Private |
PPS |
Private |
SHARES AND OTHER FINANCIAL INTERESTS
1 items
Nominal Value | No | Name of Company | Nature |
---|---|---|---|
+-7m |
9 |
Aerosud (Pty) Ltd |
Regular |
TRAVEL
1 items
Description | Sponsor |
---|---|
Visits to private schools and universaties |
Turkish Business Association |
DIRECTORSHIP AND PARTNERSHIPS
2 items
Directorship/Partnership |
---|
Aerosud (Pty) Ltd |
Malibonge Business Trust |
LAND AND PROPERTY
1 items
Description | Extent | Location |
---|---|---|
House |
800sq.m. |
Fourways |
SHARES AND OTHER FINANCIAL INTERESTS
1 items
No | Name of Company | Nature |
---|---|---|
9 |
Aerosud (Pty) Ltd |
Aviation/Engineering |
TRAVEL
1 items
Description | Sponsor |
---|---|
Invited me as a speaker - Travelling and accommodation |
Harvard University |
DIRECTORSHIP AND PARTNERSHIPS
7 items
Directorship/Partnership | Type of Business |
---|---|
Mayibongwe Imbokodo |
- |
Malibongwe Business Trust |
- |
Mkhize Family Trust |
Trust |
Pamodzi Trust |
Trust |
National Children Against Violence Trust |
Trust |
ZTE Partnership on behalf of Malibonge |
- |
Aerosud [Non-Executive Director] |
Aviation/Engineering |
GIFTS AND HOSPITALITY
1 items
Source | Description | Value |
---|---|---|
Given by a sister working for a company |
MTN invitation to Soccer City for a match |
Unknown |
LAND AND PROPERTY
2 items
Description | Extent | Location |
---|---|---|
Residential property |
850sq.m. |
Fourways |
Vacant plot |
920sq.m. |
Vulindlela |