Formerly: Limpopo Provincial Legislature
African National Congress (ANC)
Not associated with any constituency offices
[email protected]
Member at Limpopo Provincial Legislature (Provincial-Legislature)
from 21st May 2014 until 7th May 2019
Member at Ethics and Members Interest (Limpopo Provincial Legislature Committee)
until 7th May 2019
Member at Economic Development, Environmental Affairs & Tourism (Limpopo Provincial Legislature Committee)
until 7th May 2019
Member at Public Works, Roads and Infrastructure (Limpopo Provincial Legislature Committee)
until 7th May 2019
Member-elect at Limpopo Provincial Legislature (Provincial-Legislature)
from 16th May 2014 until 21st May 2014
14th Candidate at African National Congress Provincial Limpopo Election List 2014 (Election List)
from 22nd April 2014 until 7th May 2014
Member of the Provincial Legislature at Limpopo Provincial Legislature (Provincial-Legislature)
until 6th May 2014